This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 13:37:11 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Landon Senhao Zou

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Landon Senhao Zou. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gilbert, Ronald J, Powell, William Jefferson, IV, Bilash, Colin J, Malone, Steve C, Mazurek, J. David, Martinez, Alexander R and J. David Mazurek. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1739

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gilbert, Ronald J

Powell, William Jefferson, IV

Bilash, Colin J

Malone, Steve C

Mazurek, J. David

Martinez, Alexander R

J. David Mazurek

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Zou, Landon Senhao

LANDONS ZOU

ZOU, LANDON S.

ZOU, LANDONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Motion to Return Property; Department: Department S12 - SBJC; Judge: Malone, Steve C; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Order Signed and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Motion to Return Property; Department: Department S12 - SBJC; Judge: Malone, Steve C; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingType: Motion to Return Property; Department: Department S12 - SBJC; Judge: Malone, Steve C; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Request For Action - No Appearance; Department: Department S12 - SBJC; Judge: Malone, Steve C; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Action- No Appearance- Response by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Letter Received; Comments: Received from defendant's mother

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Subpoenaed Records Destroyed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 30th day is:; Comments: Court Days, per Chief Justice order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 10th Day:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 004; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - HS11352(A)-F: Transp/Sell Narcotic/Controlled Substance; JURISDICTION: Redlands; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 5/4/2021; Disposition; Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 003; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - HS11351-F: Possess/Purchase For Sale Narcotic/Controlled Substance; JURISDICTION: Redlands; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 10/18/2021; Disposition; Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Convicted - Plea; Disposition; Date: 10/18/2021; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Motion of the People; Sentence; Sentence Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Felony Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - VC2800.2(A)-F: Evading Peace Officer With Wanton Disregard For Safety; JURISDICTION: Redlands; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 10/18/2021; Disposition; Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Convicted - Plea; Disposition; Date: 10/18/2021; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Motion of the People; Sentence; Sentence Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Felony Probation; Probation; Type: Formal Probation (Supervised); Start Date: 09/17/2021; Years: 2 Years; End Date: 09/16/2023; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 284 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 142 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - VC2800.4-F: Evading An Officer Against Traffic; JURISDICTION: Redlands; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 5/4/2021; Disposition; Date: 9/17/2021; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant