This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2022 at 20:25:03 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Keandre Tavon Hill

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Keandre Tavon Hill. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold T Wilson, Jr., Garza, Donna Gunnell, Stodghill, Bryan K and Powell, William Jefferson, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1845

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Harold T Wilson, Jr.

Garza, Donna Gunnell

Stodghill, Bryan K

Powell, William Jefferson, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Hill, Keandre Tavon

BABY HARD TIMES

DRE

KEANDRE HILL

KEANDRE T HILL

KEANDREA HILL

KENADRE TAVON HILL

KENARDRE TAVON HILL

KENDRE TAVON HILL

KEYANDRE HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: In-Custody Pretrial; Department: Department S4 - SBJC; Judge: Powell, William Jefferson, IV; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Zamores, Kathleen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Mental Health Doubt Declared - Suspend proceedings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: In-Custody Pretrial; Department: Department S4 - SBJC; Judge: Powell, William Jefferson, IV; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Zamores, Kathleen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Time runs:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: In-Custody Pretrial: Also set for Bail/OR Hearing TrailingFSB22002399 30th: 9/9; Department: Department S4 - SBJC; Judge: Powell, William Jefferson, IV; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Zamores, Kathleen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Time runs:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Video Arraignment; Department: Videos - Rancho Cucamonga; Judge: Stodghill, Bryan K; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Greenlee, Gail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: 30th day is:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defense objects to PT detention and requests OR; Comments: -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Advised of Rights; Comments: - Public Defender objects to Delayed Arraignment pursuant to PC825. -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment: Cite Release, Trailing MSB21009766; Department: Department S7 - SBJC; Judge: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Reported or Recorded, Not

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketFile Type: 853.6 PC Felony/Misdemeanor Cite Release Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department S7 - SBJC; Judge: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Reported, Not

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed; Comments: DISOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Allegation - PC1170(B)(2)-A: Sentence Exceeding Middle Term; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 8/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - HS11377(a)-M: Possess Dangerous Drug/Controlled Substances; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 8/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRE APC is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant