This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 00:48:02 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. KATHLEEN ANNE DURAN

Case Summary

On 06/24/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KATHLEEN ANNE DURAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cortez, Rodney A, Swift, Bert L, Rodney A Cortez and Agron, Joel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8960

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cortez, Rodney A

Swift, Bert L

Rodney A Cortez

Agron, Joel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

DURAN, KATHLEEN ANNE

KATHLEEN ANNE BALES

KATHLEEN ANNE BULES

KATHLEEN BULES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Agency and/or Jurisdiction Corrected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Cortez, Rodney A; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Lentine, Amanda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Sentenced Pursuant to PC1170(h).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Probation Officer Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Sentenced for a total determinate term of:; Comments: 2 years, 0 months.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Revenue Recovery notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Supplemental Report Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed; Comments: Probation Officer's Supplemental Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Cortez, Rodney A; Result: Continued Party's motion; Court Reporter: Ozburn, Connie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketFile Type: Bail set at No Bail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Fingerprint Form filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 2; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony 2nd Degree - PC459-F2: Burglary- 2nd Degree; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 7/6/2016; Disposition; Date: 7/6/2016; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 7/6/2016; Description: Felony Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Eligible for County Jail Weekend/ Work Release program; Term Days: 120 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Formal Probation (Supervised); Start Date: 07/06/2016; Years: 3 Years; End Date: 07/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 1; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - PC459-F: Burglary; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 6/24/2016; Disposition; Date: 7/6/2016; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant