This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 18:27:59 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Justin Tyme Syfers

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Tyme Syfers. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Michael A and Kersey, Cheryl C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8874

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Michael A

Kersey, Cheryl C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Syfers, Justin Tyme

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Kersey, Cheryl C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketConfidential Document Filed; Comment: Discovery scanned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSesslin Affidavit filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketeFiling - Initial Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Syfers, Justin Tyme; Charge #: 002; Description: PC22210-M: Possess/Manufacture/Sell Dangerous Weapon; Statute: 22210; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Syfers, Justin Tyme; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(F)-M: Unlawful for a Person to Drive a Vehicle Under the Influence of any Drug; Statute: 23152(F); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant