This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 09:24:28 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Justin Daniel Woodring

Case Summary

On 07/10/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Daniel Woodring. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cortez, Rodney A, Swift, Bert L and Rodney A Cortez. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3402

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cortez, Rodney A

Swift, Bert L

Rodney A Cortez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Woodring, Justin Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1923.00; Payment: $1170.00; Credit: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Fees Removed Per AB177 Legislation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $35.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Fees Removed Per AB177 Legislation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketFile Type: No Action Taken; Comments: on termination from SB38 program. warrant issued 8/12/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Failure to Attend Alcohol Program; Comments: SB38 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Request For Action - No Appearance; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Cortez, Rodney A; Result: Not Held; Court Reporter: Ozburn, Connie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Court orders probation revoked.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Action- No Appearance- Response by Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Tahl Waiver filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 2; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - VC23152(B)-M: Driving under the influence alcohol/0.08 Percent or more; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 8/19/2016; Disposition; Date: 8/19/2016; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 8/19/2016; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Eligible for County Jail Weekend/ Work Release program; Term Days: 30 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 08/19/2016; End Date: 08/18/2021; Programs; Type: Attend/Complete the SB38 alcohol rehabilitation program.(18); Order Date: 08/19/2016; Enroll by Date: 10/01/2016; Complete By: 05/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 1; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 8/1/2016; Disposition; Date: 8/19/2016; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant