This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/19/2022 at 01:43:55 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. JORGE CASTRO

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JORGE CASTRO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Raphael, Tony and Seeley, Scott E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3824

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Raphael, Tony

Seeley, Scott E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

CASTRO, JORGE

CastroQuintanilla, Jorge

Quintanilla, Jorge C

Quintanilla, Jorge Castro

Quintanilla, Jorge

CastroQuintanil, Jorge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Soleimani, Nathan H

Serrao, John-Paul Anthony

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

08/10/2021: **Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

08/24/2021: **Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

09/21/2021: **Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

10/21/2021: **Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

01/10/2022: **Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketGeneral time waiver; Comment: REMAINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPretrial Worksheet filed; Comment: Continued for negotiations.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPretrial; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Result: Continued Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketGeneral time waiver; Comment: GIVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPretrial Worksheet filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPretrial; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(B)-M: Driving Under the Influence Alcohol/0.08 Percent or More; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDistrict Attorney Notified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketTime waived to:; Comment: (45 days beyond 10/21/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney for Defendant Waives Arraign./Rights (Comp./Cit.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequested Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest To Calendar Case In-Person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketContinued Arraignment; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Seeley, Scott E.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: per DA use valid cite date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDUI with priors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketeFiling - Initial Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CASTRO, JORGE; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(B)-M: Driving Under the Influence Alcohol/0.08 Percent or More; Statute: 23152(B); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CASTRO, JORGE; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; Citation: KK53585; Statute: 23152(A); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERRAO, JOHN-PAUL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLEIMANI NATHAN H.