This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 13:55:54 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. JONATHAN ESCOBARGARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONATHAN ESCOBARGARCIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin J Bilash, Powell, William Jefferson, IV and Tavill, Gregory S. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1886

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Colin J Bilash

Powell, William Jefferson, IV

Tavill, Gregory S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

ESCOBARGARCIA, JONATHAN

ESCOBAR

GARCIA, JONATHAN

JOHNATHAN ESCOBAR GRACCIA

JONATHAN ESCOBAR GARCIA

Not Yet Classified

REMEDY BAIL BONDS- SAN BERNARDINO

FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Petition to Revoke Probation Filed, Signed and Scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Court orders probation revoked.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Petition To Initiate Proceedings To Revoke Probation Receive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Probation Officer Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Department of Justice Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Relinquishment Form Findings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: PC 859 Sentencing; Department: Department S20 - SBJC; Judge: Tavill, Gregory S; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Const./court operations fee of $70 per conviction (RR); Filed By: JONATHAN ESCOBARGARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Total monthly payment schedule ordered at:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 30th day is:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: 60th day is:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bail set at No Bail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Bond Exonerated; Comments: Bond FCS25-2292615

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bond Posted; Comments: Bond FCS25-2292615

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed; Comments: DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - VC2800.2(A)-F: Evading Peace Officer With Wanton Disregard For Safety; JURISDICTION: Big Bear City; Plea; Description: No Contest; Plea Date: 9/15/2021; Disposition; Date: 9/15/2021; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 11/15/2021; Description: Felony Probation; Probation; Type: Formal Probation (Supervised); Start Date: 11/15/2021; Years: 2 Years; End Date: 11/14/2023; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 180 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 72 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less