This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 07:31:46 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. JERRY PARISH

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JERRY PARISH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James R Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2379

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

James R Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

PARISH, JERRY DON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/04/2022

DocketFile Type: Case Update to Revenue Recovery

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $858.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2022

DocketFile Type: Civil Assessment Removed Per AB199 Legislation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2022

DocketFile Type: Case Assigned to Revenue Recovery

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Notice 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Eligible Case 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2022

ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC40508(A)-I: Failure To Appear (DMV Hold); JURISDICTION: County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $300.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $89.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
02/05/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Notice 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Eligible Case 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Notice 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2022

DocketFile Type: Failure To Appear Eligible Case 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021

DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021

DocketFile Type: Appear by Date Extension

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2021

DocketFile Type: Courtesy Notice Printed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2021

DocketFile Type: Citation Image Loaded

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $469.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2021

ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC22406(B)-I: Maximum Speed Towing; Citation Number: LA56946; JURISDICTION: County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less