This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 09:55:29 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jeremy James Gurule

Case Summary

On 07/17/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jeremy James Gurule. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cortez, Rodney A, Swift, Bert L, Ortiz, Joseph T and Rodney A Cortez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3811

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cortez, Rodney A

Swift, Bert L

Ortiz, Joseph T

Rodney A Cortez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Gurule, Jeremy James

JEREMY GURULE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Hearing on Revocation of Probation; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Cortez, Rodney A; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Ozburn, Connie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Requested Modification; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Masih, Rowena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $500.00; Payment: $500.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge Reduction; Charges: $-35.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketFile Type: Request To Calendar Received By Phone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketFile Type: Agency and/or Jurisdiction Corrected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $50.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: JT-2017-0002953

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: JT-2017-0002321

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: JT-2017-0001797

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Advised of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Request To Calendar Received By Phone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Requested Arraignment On Bench Warrant; Department: Department M1 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Request To Calendar Received By Phone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment; Department: Department M2 - Joshua Tree; Judge: Swift, Bert L; Result: Failed to Appear; Court Reporter: Fata, Numia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 1; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC290(B)-M: Fail To Register W/I 5 Working Days; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 11/9/2016; Disposition; Date: 12/8/2016; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 12/8/2016; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 12/08/2016; End Date: 12/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant