This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 15:21:48 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jennifer Sue Ellis

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jennifer Sue Ellis. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cortez, Rodney A, Swift, Bert L, Ortiz, Joseph T and Rodney A Cortez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5826

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cortez, Rodney A

Swift, Bert L

Ortiz, Joseph T

Rodney A Cortez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Ellis, Jennifer Sue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2029
  • DocketFile Type: Note:; Comments: Auto Close and DOJ errors complete - JA portions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $2087.00; Payment: $2087.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $14.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: JT-2020-0002207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $14.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Copy Sent:; Comments: of prior pack to Idaho Dept of Health and Welfare

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant called requesting information on case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFile Type: Letter Received; Filed By: Jennifer Ellis; Comments: Copy request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Adjustment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $1888.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $1888.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: General time waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Criminal Protective Order Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 004; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - VC23152(B)-M: Driving under the influence alcohol/0.08 Percent or more; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 8/28/2018; Disposition; Date: 7/29/2016; Description: Convicted - Plea; Disposition; Date: 8/28/2018; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - PC1203.4/ PC1203.42/PC236.14; Sentence; Sentence Date: 7/29/2016; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 13 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 7 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 07/29/2016; Years: 3 Years; End Date: 07/29/2019; Programs; Type: Attend/Complete the AB541 alcohol education program.; Order Date: 07/29/2016; Enroll by Date: 09/01/2016; Complete By: 03/01/2017; Programs; Type: Attend/Complete a Child Abuse Prevention Program (52 weeks).; Order Date: 07/29/2016; Enroll by Date: 10/14/2016; Complete By: 10/14/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 003; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - VC23152(A)-M: Driving Under the Influence; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 7/26/2016; Disposition; Date: 7/29/2016; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC273A(B)-M: Willful Cruelty To Child; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 7/26/2016; Disposition; Date: 7/29/2016; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2016
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC273A(B)-M: Willful Cruelty To Child; JURISDICTION: County; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 7/26/2016; Disposition; Date: 7/29/2016; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant