This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 03:25:35 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. HOLLIDAY ROCK CO INC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOLLIDAY ROCK CO INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie Thornton-Harris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7114

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stephanie Thornton-Harris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

HOLLIDAY ROCK CO INC

Not Yet Classified

ROJASARANGO, ARTURO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Courtesy Notice Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $860.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $860.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC35551(A)-I: Weight Axle/Dist Less Than 4501 Lbs; Citation Number: 1065681; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC23114(B)(2)(D)-I: Aggregate Material-Fail Comp Equipment Required; Citation Number: 1065681; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLIDAY ROCK COMPANY INC. ERRONEOSLY SU is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant