This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:09:10 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. ERIC JAMES AVILA

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ERIC JAMES AVILA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander R Martinez, Gilbert, Ronald J and Bilash, Colin J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0514

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Alexander R Martinez

Gilbert, Ronald J

Bilash, Colin J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

AVILA, ERIC JAMES

AVILA, ERIC

DOE, JOHN DOE

DOE, JOHN ONE

ERIC AVILA

ERICK, RHODES

JOHN DOE DOE

JOHN ONE DOE

RHODES ERICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Other Hearing; Department: Department S2 - SBJC; Judge: Bilash, Colin J; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Cohen, Courtney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Court Found Plea Was Knowledgeable, Intelligently Made,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Tahl Waiver filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Plea Bargain Agreement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant advised of Charges and Direct Consequences of Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Trial by Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: 30th day is:; Comments: Court Days, per Chief Justice order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFile Type: 60th day is:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed; Comments: Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony 1st Degree - PC459-F1: Burglary - 1st Degree; JURISDICTION: Highland; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2/23/2022; Disposition; Date: 3/8/2022; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC594(A)-M: Vandalism Under $1000 Damage; JURISDICTION: Highland; Plea; Description: No Contest; Plea Date: 3/8/2022; Disposition; Date: 3/8/2022; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 3/8/2022; Description: Terminal Disposition; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 36 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 18 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant