This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 13:18:21 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Eleazar Bryan Lopez

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Eleazar Bryan Lopez. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mazurek, J. David, J. David Mazurek and Martinez, Alexander R. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1549

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mazurek, J. David

J. David Mazurek

Martinez, Alexander R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Lopez, Eleazar Bryan

Not Yet Classified

BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BONDS

FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GREENBERG, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Probation Officer Notified; Comments: prohibited persons sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Relinquishment Form Findings; Comments: prohibited persons sent to bureau of firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Relinquishment Form Findings

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Probation Officer's Memo Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $235.00; Payment: $235.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $235.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SB-2022-0003159

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Dispo / Reset; Department: Department S18 - SBJC; Judge: Martinez, Alexander R; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Moore, Leslie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $235.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Court Found Plea Was Knowledgeable, Intelligently Made,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Plea Bargain Agreement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Case Assigned for All Purposes to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Arraignment: BOND; Department: Department S11 - SBJC; Judge: Mazurek, J. David; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Bond Posted; Comments: FCS25-2242983

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC247.5-M: Discharge Laser At Occupied Aircraft; JURISDICTION: Highland; Plea; Description: Guilty; Plea Date: 2/3/2022; Disposition; Date: 2/3/2022; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 2/3/2022; Description: Misdemeanor Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Eligible for County Jail Weekend/ Work Release program; Term Days: 120 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Summary Probation (Court); Start Date: 02/03/2022; End Date: 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BAIL HOTLINE BAIL BOND COMPAY is a litigant

Latest cases where Financial Casualty & Surety Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant