This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/10/2022 at 06:49:08 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS INC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James R Baxter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1759

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

James R Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

COMMAND PERFORMANCE CONSTRUCTORS INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $50.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $50.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: BS-2021-0013825

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Adjustment; Charges: $-353.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Corrections provided

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Courtesy Notice Printed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $353.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC34506.3-27-I: 1232A - Ownrs Duty To Inspect; Citation Number: KU83798; JURISDICTION: County; Disposition; Date: 12/6/2021; Description: Dismissal - Infraction Proof of Correction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC34506.3-1(A)-I: 1251D-Hydrolic Elevating Sys; Citation Number: KU83798; JURISDICTION: County; Disposition; Date: 12/6/2021; Description: Dismissal - Infraction Proof of Correction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less