This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 08:08:20 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Bryce Kailan Brewer

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Bryce Kailan Brewer. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander R Martinez, Gilbert, Ronald J and Bilash, Colin J. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0505

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Alexander R Martinez

Gilbert, Ronald J

Bilash, Colin J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Brewer, Bryce Kailan

BREWER, BRYCE

BRYCE BREWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Probation Officer Notified; Comments: prohibited persons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Relinquishment Form Findings; Comments: prohibited persons to bureau of firearms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingType: Preliminary Hearing; Department: Department S2 - SBJC; Judge: Bilash, Colin J; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Pre-Preliminary Hearing: Bail/O.R. to be heard pursuant to PC1270.2(a); Department: Department S2 - SBJC; Judge: Bilash, Colin J; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Cohen, Courtney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration by Defendant Filed; Comments: 859a Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Waived Right to Trial by Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Court Found Plea Was Knowledgeable, Intelligently Made,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Total monthly payment schedule ordered at:; Comments: Central Collections 268 West Hospitality Lane 2nd Floor San Bernardino, CA 92415 (909) 387-8303 beginning 60 days from today

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Advised of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Waiver of Personal Presence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Enhancement - PC25850(C)(6)-E: Non Registered Owner Of A Handgun; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Disposition; Date: 3/1/2022; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 002; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - PC25850(A)-F: Carrying Loaded Firearm; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2/22/2022; Disposition; Date: 3/1/2022; Description: Dismissal/Stricken - Pursuant to Plea

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Felony - HS11370.1(A)-F: Possess Controlled Substance While Armed With Loaded/Etc Firearm; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Plea; Description: No Contest; Plea Date: 3/1/2022; Disposition; Date: 3/1/2022; Description: Convicted - Plea; Sentence; Sentence Date: 3/1/2022; Description: Felony Probation; Confinement and Detention; Adult Confinement Type: County Jail; Term Type: Straight Sentence; Term Days: 90 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 11 Days; Balance to be served at credit rate of: PC 4019 (1/2); Probation; Type: Formal Probation (Supervised); Start Date: 03/01/2022; End Date: 02/29/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant