This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 00:25:47 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. ANDREW MARTIN SUBLETT

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANDREW MARTIN SUBLETT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A Smith, Trager-Dvorak, Denise, Yabuno, R. Glenn, Garza, Donna Gunnell and Tavill, Gregory S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4190

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Michael A Smith

Trager-Dvorak, Denise

Yabuno, R. Glenn

Garza, Donna Gunnell

Tavill, Gregory S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

SUBLETT, ANDREW MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

 

Court Documents

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingType: Pretrial; Department: Department S5 - SBJC; Judge: Trager-Dvorak, Denise

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Pitchess Motion: GTW; Department: Department S5 - SBJC; Judge: Trager-Dvorak, Denise; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Pretrial Worksheet filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketFile Type: General time waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Motion Filed; Comments: Motion for disclosure of peace officer records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Opposition Filed Re:; Comments: Opposition to defendant's motion for pretrial discovery (pitchess) on the merits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Pretrial; Department: Department S5 - SBJC; Judge: Trager-Dvorak, Denise; Result: Held; Court Reporter: Reported or Recorded, Not

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Pretrial Worksheet filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: General time waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Motion Filed; Comments: FOR DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO 1043 PITCHES, REQUEST TO CALENDAR AND 1050 MOTION & P&A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Time runs:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Public Defender Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Defendant Arraigned on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: District Attorney Notified

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Advisement of Rights filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Confidential Document Filed; Comments: DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Sesslin Affidavit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFile Type: eFiling - Initial Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Misdemeanor - PC148(A)(1)-M: Obstructs/Resists/Public Officer; JURISDICTION: San Bernardino; Plea; Description: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 9/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant