This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2022 at 01:14:55 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. AMERICAN LOGISTICS INC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AMERICAN LOGISTICS INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James R Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9056

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

James R Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Not Yet Classified and Defendant

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Courtesy Notice Printed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $274.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $274.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2022

ChargeCOUNT: 001; RESULT: CHARGE; DETAILS: Infraction - VC4000(A)(1)-I: Vehicle Registration Fees Due; Citation Number: 7HYX006QL; JURISDICTION: County

[+] Read More [-] Read Less