This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 19:29:44 (UTC).

Young -v- Broadspire Services, Inc.,ACE American Insurance Company,Keolis Transit America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Young filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Broadspire Services, Inc ,ACE American Insurance Company,Keolis Transit America, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, James R. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0769

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, James R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Young, Joseph

Defendants

Broadspire Services, Inc

ACE American Insurance Company

Keolis Transit America, Inc

CSE Lawyers Incorporating Services

CT Corporation System

Cogency Global Inc.

 

Court Documents

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment Filed

02/08/2022: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment Filed

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

01/21/2022: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

01/19/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

01/18/2022: REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

01/14/2022: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

01/14/2022: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

01/14/2022: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

01/14/2022: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

01/14/2022: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

01/14/2022: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

12/20/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment Filed; Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail Received from Postal Service; Comment: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer as to Keolis Transit America, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail Received from Postal Service; Comment: 01/14/2022 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail Received from Postal Service; Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Correct or Cancel Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: The multiple faxes received on 1/13/22 are being returned because they are incorrect. We received the same fax multiple times. None of them were complete and they were not in legal format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Baxter, James R; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - After Hearing (Contested); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Broadspire Services, Inc.; ACE American Insurance Company; Keolis Transit America, Inc.; Awarded Against: Young, Joseph; Amount; No Judgment Awarded; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 1/14/2022 MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialYoung, Joseph; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: Broadspire Services Inc. Tracking # 7016 2710 0000 2548 8795

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: Ace American Insurance Company Tracking # 7016 2710 0000 2548 8818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: Keolis Transit America, Inc Tracking # 7016 2710 0000 2548 8801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • FinancialYoung, Joseph; Fee Waiver; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialYoung, Joseph; Transaction Assessment; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialYoung, Joseph; Total Financial Assessment: $133.00; Total Payments and Credits: $133.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadspire Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COGENCY GLOBAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant