This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 01:31:28 (UTC).

Whisler -v- Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Whisler filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacheco, John M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2465

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pacheco, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whisler, Denise Dee

Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

The Mortgage Law Firm, A Professional Law Corporation

Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc

Fidelity National Title Company

Lawyers Title Company

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A

Wells Fargo Bank, National Association

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lewin, James Falk

Fidelity National Law Group

Attorney at Fidelity National Law Group

 

Court Documents

Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of

02/08/2022: Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of

Miscellaneous Document Filed

01/26/2022: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

01/26/2022: Opposition to Motion Filed

Ex Parte Order Filed

01/26/2022: Ex Parte Order Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/26/2022: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Notice Filed

01/21/2022: Notice Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/21/2022: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Declaration Filed

01/20/2022: Declaration Filed

Ex Parte Filed

01/20/2022: Ex Parte Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

12/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

12/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

12/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

12/14/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/14/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

11/18/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Request for Judicial Notice Filed

11/15/2021: Request for Judicial Notice Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

11/15/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

11/15/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Pacheco, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Attorney Broersma to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of; Comment: Total Costs: $930.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Pacheco, John M; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court-Ordered - Before Trial; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of non-party defendants Fedelity National Title company and Lawyers title company filed by Plaintiff Dr. Denise Dee Whisler 1/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: (1) opposing counsel's tainted sham ex parte for involuntary dismissal (2) unauthorized Fidelity National Law Groups Fictitious Demurrer and (3) Unauthorized attorney Alejandro P. Pacheco's Meritless RJN Filed by Dr. Denise Dee Whisler 1/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 1/26/22 minute order/court's ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Order Filed; Comment: Granting Ex Parte Application for Involuntary Dismissal of Plaintiff's Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketRemote Hearing Held Via Court Call

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Pacheco, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: APP FOR INVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of Continued Ex Parte Hearing re Involuntary Dismissal of Pla's Action Filed by Def's Fidelity National Titla Company and Lawyers Title Company; filed 1/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued; Comment: No Summons provided with initiating documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialLawyers Title Company; Total Financial Assessment: $465.00; Total Payments and Credits: $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialFidelity National Title Company; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialWhisler, Denise Dee; Total Financial Assessment: $705.00; Total Payments and Credits: $705.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketVolume Begins on this Date; Comment: vol 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MORTGAGE LAW FIRM PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant