This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 18:10:35 (UTC).

Walters Wholesale Electric Co. -v- Rowan, Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Walters Wholesale Electric Co filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Rowan, Incorporated. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2523

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Walters Wholesale Electric Co

a California corporation

Defendants

Rowan, Incorporated

HSH-Ranch Owner Ca, LLC

Pacificore Construction, Inc

Texas Capital Bank

a California corporation

a Delaware limited liability company

entity form unknown

Does 1-500

Texas Capital Bank, N.A

a Texas State Financial Institution

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDEN, JONES, COLE & JOHNSON

Attorney at MADDEN, JONES, COLE & JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

08/24/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

08/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

08/24/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

08/25/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

08/25/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

09/28/2021: Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

09/30/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Dismissal Filed as to Complaint

10/20/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Before Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Complaint; Comment: without prejudice as to complaint filed by Plaintiff Walters Wholesale Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialWalters Wholesale Electric Co.; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-60301; Walters Wholesale Electric Co.; $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • FinancialWalters Wholesale Electric Co.; Transaction Assessment; $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $49.00 credit card payment paid on 10/18/2021 for lis pendens and fax fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed; Comment: of Defendant Texas Capital Bank, entity form unknown filed by Plaintiff on Complaint filed 8/24/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialWalters Wholesale Electric Co.; Turbo Court; Receipt # SC-2021-49971; Walters Wholesale Electric Co.; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialWalters Wholesale Electric Co.; Transaction Assessment; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • FinancialWalters Wholesale Electric Co.; Total Financial Assessment: $429.00; Total Payments and Credits: $429.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $380 tc paid on 8/25/21 for 1st appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: filed by Plaintiff Walters Wholesale Electric Co. against all defendants on 8/24/21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Capital Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rowan Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICORE CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant