This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 07:52:55 (UTC).

Thomas -v- Perez et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Thomas filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Perez. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tomberlin, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7792

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tomberlin, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas, Sharonda

Defendants

Perez, Alfredo

Perez, Alicia

Intergrated Lender Services, Inc

Redwood Holdings, LLC

Federal Escrow, Inc

an individual

a Delaware corporation

a California corporation

DOES 1 through 20, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARLY SULLIVAN WRIGHT GIZER & MCRAE

Attorney at EARLY SULLIVAN WRIGHT GIZER & MCRAE

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

01/19/2022: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice Filed

01/10/2022: Notice Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

11/15/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

Amended Complaint Filed

12/14/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

Objection Filed

12/08/2021: Objection Filed

Reply Filed

12/08/2021: Reply Filed

Declaration Filed

12/02/2021: Declaration Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

12/02/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Amended Document Filed re:

11/24/2021: Amended Document Filed re:

Declaration Filed

11/24/2021: Declaration Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

11/15/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

11/15/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Request for Judicial Notice Filed

11/12/2021: Request for Judicial Notice Filed

Motion to Stay

11/12/2021: Motion to Stay

Opposition to Motion Filed

11/12/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Request for Judicial Notice Filed

11/12/2021: Request for Judicial Notice Filed

Ex Parte Application

11/12/2021: Ex Parte Application

Notice of Hearing Sent

11/02/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2022-07769; Thomas, Sharonda; $5.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Transaction Assessment; $5.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2022-03529; Thomas, Sharonda; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Transaction Assessment; $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Pla's Notice of Related Case - a form must be completed for each case to be related and they must be submitted together.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $3 cc paid on 1/19/22 for fax filing fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Tomberlin, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: pltfs' Motion to Stay and/or Consolidate UD Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: of Conditional settlement and taking motion off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $90.00 ck Paid on 11/12/21 for Ex Parte Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Turbo Court; Receipt # SC-2021-63215; Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae LLP; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialThomas, Sharonda; Total Financial Assessment: $623.30; Total Payments and Credits: $623.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 Turbocourt paid on 11/02/21 for New Filing First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Sharonda Thomas filed 11/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Sharonda Thomas filed against Defendants on Complaint filed 11/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A Delaware Corp. XPO Logistics is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where INTEGRATED LENDER SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant