This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 18:36:02 (UTC).

THE WALTER G WALKER AND BARBARA C WALKER

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 THE WALTER G WALKER AND BARBARA C WALKER was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Reilly, Tara. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0078

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

Judge Details

Judge

Reilly, Tara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THORNBURG, JAMES

Other

THE WALTER G WALKER AND BARBARA C WALKER

Not Yet Classified

CONV

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robbins, Diane Evans

 

Court Documents

PETITION RE- APPOINT TRUSTEE AND TO CLARIFY NAME O

04/07/2021: PETITION RE- APPOINT TRUSTEE AND TO CLARIFY NAME O

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

04/07/2021: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07-07-21 FILED.

04/27/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07-07-21 FILED.

Examiner Notes - 1st Check

07/07/2021: Examiner Notes - 1st Check

Examiner Notes - 2nd Check

07/07/2021: Examiner Notes - 2nd Check

Order Filed Re:

07/07/2021: Order Filed Re:

Miscellaneous Document Filed

07/07/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Surety Bond Issued

07/27/2021: Surety Bond Issued

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed

11/04/2021: Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed

**PR - Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSurety Bond Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialTHORNBURG, JAMES; Counter Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0006442; THORNBURG, JAMES; $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialTHORNBURG, JAMES; Transaction Assessment; $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: SUPPLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: APPOINTING TRUSTEE AND CALRIFY NAME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: PETITION FOR APPOINT TRUSTEE AND TO CLARIFY NAME OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 09:05 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PETITION FOR APPOINT TRUSTEE AND TO CLARIFY NAME OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20210409-0036; ConversionPayment; $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialTHORNBURG, JAMES; Total Financial Assessment: $41.00; Total Payments and Credits: $41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $465.00; Total Payments and Credits: $465.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES THORNBURG FOR PETITION FEE 210409-0036-CK PBG/ 435.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210409-0036-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 20381

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed; Comment: PETITION RE: APPOINT TRUSTEE AND TO CLARIFY NAME OF TRUST FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Probate); Comment: PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketConversion event; Comment: 0001 - ET PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBBINS DIANE EVANS