This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 18:28:56 (UTC).

The Factory Depot Advantages INC -v- Viatek Consumer Products INC et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 The Factory Depot Advantages INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Viatek Consumer Products INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, Bryan and Bryan Foster. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3888

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, Bryan

Bryan Foster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Factory Depot Advantages INC

Defendants

Viatek Consumer Products INC

HSN, INC

Does 1 to 10

Products Plus, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ATTORNEYS, APC

Defendant Attorneys

McCoy Leavitt Laskey LLC

Law Offices of John A Hauser

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

* Public *

Miscellaneous Document Filed

* Public *

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Request to Enter Default Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Answer Filed

* Public *

Notice Returning Documents

* Public *

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Department: Department S22 - SBJC; Judge: Foster, Bryan; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Department: Department S22 - SBJC; Judge: Foster, Bryan; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Filed By: The Factory Depot Advantages INC; Comments: With Prejudice- as to entire action filed by plaintiff The Factory Depot Advantages on 08/31/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice Filed; Filed By: Products Plus, INC; Comments: of entry of order allowing the filing of products plus inc's summons and cross-complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation & Order filed; Filed By: Products Plus, INC; Comments: to Allow the Filing of a Summons and Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $2076.00; Payment: $2076.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $20.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-20881

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $20.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-14473

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $451.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-12516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $16.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 02/24/21 Complaint filed by The Factory Depot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Filed By: The Factory Depot Advantages INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: The Factory Depot Advantages INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: The Factory Depot Advantages INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: The Factory Depot Advantages INC; Comments: $451 visa paid on 03/11/21 for first appearance/fax fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less