This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 00:51:54 (UTC).

THE BAKHTIAR FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 THE BAKHTIAR FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Not Yet Classified lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reilly, Tara, Nassar, William and Daniel, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0068

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judges

Reilly, Tara

Nassar, William

Daniel, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARYAM JARAMILLO

REZA AMIRALAI

JARAMILLO, MARYAM

AMIRALAI, REZA

Other

THE BAKHTIAR FAMILY TRUST

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Not Classified By Court

HICKMAN, JOHNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KEYSTONE LAW GROUPP.C.

11300 W Olympic Blvd Ste 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Keystone Law Group PC

Attorney at Keystone Law Group PC

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Abdeljawad, Eyad Yaser

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Filed

09/09/2021: Notice of Hearing Filed

Objection Filed

09/02/2021: Objection Filed

**PR - Portal Minute Order

09/01/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

09/01/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

08/26/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

**PR - Portal Minute Order

08/26/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

**PR - Portal Minute Order

08/26/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

Request for Special Notice Filed

08/24/2021: Request for Special Notice Filed

Creditor's Claim Filed

08/24/2021: Creditor's Claim Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

08/23/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

**PR - Portal Minute Order

08/12/2021: **PR - Portal Minute Order

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

08/11/2021: Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Petition to Confirm Trust Assets (850)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed; Comment: 12/01/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialJARAMILLO, MARYAM; Mail Payment; Receipt # SB-2021-0010075; JARAMILLO, MARYAM; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • FinancialJARAMILLO, MARYAM; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Hearing; Judicial Officer: Reilly, Tara; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for Instructions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialHICKMAN, JOHNETTE; Fee Waiver; $522.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialHICKMAN, JOHNETTE; Transaction Assessment; $522.00

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialHICKMAN, JOHNETTE; Total Financial Assessment: $957.00; Total Payments and Credits: $957.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialJARAMILLO, MARYAM; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $465.00; Total Payments and Credits: $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY MARYAM JARAMILLO, REZA AMIRALAI FOR TRUST PETITION 210319-0182-CK PBG/ 435.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 210319-0182-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 161415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed; Comment: PETITION RE: COURT ORDER CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Probate); Comment: PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketConversion event; Comment: 0001 - ET PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABDELJAWAD EYAD YASER