This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 03:04:57 (UTC).

T-Mobile West LLC -v- Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 T-Mobile West LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4527

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T-Mobile West LLC

Defendants

Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership

Zenith Energy West Coast Terminals LLC

Verizon Wireless

a Delaware limited liability company

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nossaman LLP

Attorney at Nossaman LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

08/26/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

08/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

08/26/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

09/21/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

09/21/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

09/22/2021: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; T-Mobile West LLC; Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership; Zenith Energy West Coast Terminals LLC; Does 1 through 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: Filed by plaintiff T-Mobile West LLC without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialT-Mobile West LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-55035; socal legal; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialT-Mobile West LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialT-Mobile West LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 ck paid on 9.21.21 for 1st paper fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: filed by plaintiff t-mobile west filed 8.26.21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOS ANGELES SMSA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA VERIZON is a litigant

Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant