This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 02:16:35 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company -v- Guadamez et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Guadamez. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald J Gilbert and Williams, David A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6106

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ronald J Gilbert

Williams, David A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

A CORPORATION

Defendants

Guadamez, Crystal

CRYSTAL GUADAMUZ

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haines, Todd Frederick

 

Court Documents

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

* Public *

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingType: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Department: Department S17 - SBJC; Judge: Williams, David A; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; Comments: Filed by Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on complaint filed 3/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $380.00; Payment: $380.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $380.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-21133

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $380.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 03/18/2022 Complaint file by plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Todd Haines; Comments: $380.00 check paid on 04-01-22 for 1st appearance fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less