This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 12:50:57 (UTC).

SOMMER FUNN -v- WAYNE FUNN

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 SOMMER FUNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WAYNE FUNN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0607

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FUNN, SOMMER

Respondent

FUNN, WAYNE C

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Returned agreement for judgment. If you are wishing to finalize your divorce the agreement must be attached to form fl-180. You are also still needing to submit a proof of service of summons re: the amended summons/petition. You are also missing several other forms. If you proceed by default you need to submit form fl-165,fl-170 fl-141 for the preliminary for both parties and respondent's signature would need to be notarized on the agreement. If the respondent is wishing to appear then form Fl-130 would need to be submitted and first appearance fees would need to be paid. Please seek legal assistance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: Agreement for judgment only received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued; Comment: 1st Amended Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAmended Family Law Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS OF FILING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: Personal service: Petition, Summons, FL105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WAYNE C FUNN; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/24/21 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE FAX COVER SHEET IS MISSING, PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH IT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20210127-0025; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA filed; Comment: DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketInformational Check List Provided (FL200); Comment: INFORMATIONAL CHECK LIST PROVIDED TO SOMMER FUNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 210127-0025-EZ LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT 210127-0025-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER 24S84379VB872172

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant