This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 22:52:39 (UTC).

Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC -v- Snow-Line Orchard, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Snow-Line Orchard, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. and Wilfred J Schneider, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7580

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

Wilfred J Schneider, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

A California Limited Liability Company

Steven glass and Carol Glass,

Donald and Tedi Anderson

Kevin M Charnesky and Jerri G Charnesky

AS TRUSTEES OF THE GLASS FAMILY TRUST DATED APRIL 12,2012

Miller, Stephen E

Fritzsche, Gary E

Fritzsche, Deanna R

Defendants

Snow-Line Orchard, LLC

The Hudson Living Trust

Hudson, Michael

County of San Bernardino

California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control

A California Limited Liability Company

A California Trust

A Municipal Corporation

A Governmental Agency

DOES 1-100

San Bernardino County

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Alvaradosmith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Miscellaneous Document Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Request for Judicial Notice Filed

* Public *

Demurrer Filed

* Public *

Declaration re:

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Amended Complaint Filed

* Public *

Miscellaneous Document Filed

* Public *

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

* Public *

Declaration re:

* Public *

Demurrer Filed

* Public *

Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action

* Public *

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/16/2024

HearingType: Jury Trial: 7 days; Department: Department S32 - SBJC; Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2024

HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Department: Department S32 - SBJC; Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Hearing is Hereby Continued to:; Comments: January 16, 2024 at 10 am in Department S32 for Jury Trial due to the Holiday set on January 15, 2024.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC; Comments: Notice of Ruling at trial setting conference filed by plainitff Snow- Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Further Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S32 - SBJC; Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: At-Issue Memorandum Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC; Comments: Trial Setting Conference 5/13/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Answer Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Orchard, LLC, The Hudson Living Trust, Michael Hudson; Comments: filed by defendants on the 2nd amended compliant filed 2/8/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Amended Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 02.08.22 2nd Amended complaint Original complaint filed 6.07.21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed; Filed By: Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC, Steven glass and Carol Glass,, Stephen Miller, Gary Fritzsche, Deanna Fritzsche, James & Mary Hackett, Donald and Tedi Anderson, Kevin M Charnesky and Jerri G Charnesky; Comments: 2nd Amended complaint filed 02.08.22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
06/23/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37386

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC; Comments: 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 06/07/21 for Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 06/07/21 Complaint FIled by Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC; Comments: Verification to Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC's Complaint and Petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Snow-Line Preservation Association, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less