This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 13:10:14 (UTC).

SJO Investments, LLC -v- Robles Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 SJO Investments, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Robles Jr. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8055

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SJO Investments, LLC

a limited liability company

Defendants

Robles Jr., Albert F

as trustee of the Albert F. Robles, Jr. Family Trust dated August 25, 2010

Does 1 though 50

Not Yet Classified

Robles, Jr., Albert F

trustee of the Albert F., Robles, Jr. Family Trust dated August 25, 2010

SJO Investments, LLC, a liability company

ROES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Chandler Law Firm

Attorney at Chandler Law Firm

Enochs Law Group, APC

Attorney at Enochs Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

10/25/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

10/21/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

10/20/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

Answer Filed

07/14/2021: Answer Filed

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

04/30/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

05/21/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Summons Issued on

05/18/2021: Summons Issued on

Miscellaneous Document Filed

05/13/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

05/13/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed

05/13/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

04/23/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

04/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

04/19/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

04/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

04/19/2021: Complaint Filed

**Corrected Portal Minute Order**

04/19/2021: **Corrected Portal Minute Order**

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/19/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Declaration re:

04/16/2021: Declaration re:

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Comment: filed by def robles on 10/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: Filed by defendant SJO investments on 1st cross complaint filed 05.13.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialRobles Jr., Albert F.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-28044; chandler law firm; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialRobles Jr., Albert F.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on; Comment: Plaintiff's 1st Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialRobles Jr., Albert F.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-19699; SJO Investments, LLC; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • FinancialSJO Investments, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $90.00 check paid on 04/15/2021 for Ex Parte Motion Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Jeffrey D. Poindexter in Support of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Dillon Mendoza in Support of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of Scott Oots in Support of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application; Comment: for 1. Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order Preventing the Sale of Real Property, 2. Order for the Filing of the Complaint and Assigning a Case Number to the Action

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SJO INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant