This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 11:37:41 (UTC).

Sharp -v- Bertheola-Ozuna et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Sharp filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Bertheola-Ozuna. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apaloo, Khymberli S. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7019

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Apaloo, Khymberli S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Sharp, Sarah

An Individual

Defendants

Berthold-Ozuna, Mara

Aaron's, INC

An Individual

A Georgia Corporation

Does 1 through 50

Aaron's LLC

Bertheola-Ozuna, Mara

Aaron's Inc

Berthhold-Ozuna, Mara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Stansbury Brown Law

Attorney at Stansbury Brown Law

Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP

Attorney at Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/13/2022: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service Filed

01/06/2022: Proof of Service Filed

Declaration Filed

01/06/2022: Declaration Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

01/06/2022: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Reply Filed

01/06/2022: Reply Filed

Declaration Filed

12/29/2021: Declaration Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

12/29/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service

11/02/2021: Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service

Proof of Service Filed

11/01/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Points and Authorities Filed

11/01/2021: Points and Authorities Filed

Declaration Filed

11/01/2021: Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed

11/01/2021: Declaration Filed

Motion re:

11/01/2021: Motion re:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/14/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/14/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

10/14/2021: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

Order Filed Re:

10/13/2021: Order Filed Re:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

10/13/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketArbitration - Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCourt Orders Matter Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendants Aaron's, LLC and Mara Bertheola-Ozuna's notice of motion and motion to compel arbitration and stay action.Filed by defendant Aaron's LLC on complaint filed 3/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: Served Def's Reply, Declaration, Supp Declaration on 1/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of S Taylor ISO Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed 1/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: Supplemental Declaration of K Greenbaum ISO Def's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action; filed 1/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Filed; Comment: Def's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action; filed on 1/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Ethan C. Surls in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action for 1/13/22 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action for 1/13/22 hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialSharp, Sarah; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialBertheola-Ozuna, Mara; Total Financial Assessment: $465.00; Total Payments and Credits: $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialAaron's, INC; Total Financial Assessment: $455.00; Total Payments and Credits: $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialSharp, Sarah; Total Financial Assessment: $455.00; Total Payments and Credits: $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 check paid on 04/13/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A Georgia Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AARON'S is a litigant