This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 17:08:21 (UTC).

SA Marina, LLC -v- Rancho Del Chino, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 SA Marina, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rancho Del Chino, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2738

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SA Marina, LLC

a California Limited Liability Company

Defendants

Che Chen Liu and Shu Fen Liu

Athena Property Management

Newmark Knight Frank

Rancho Del Chino, LLC

Trustees of the Che Chen Liu and Shu Fen Liu Revocable Trust dated October 9, 2012

an unknown business entity

Levy Affiliated Holdings. LLC

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilkes, Robert Lodge

 

Court Documents

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

09/20/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

09/08/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

09/08/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Notice of Hearing Sent

08/26/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

08/26/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

08/25/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

08/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

08/25/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Poncin, Lynn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff SA Marina LLC serving Defendant Newmark Knight Frank on 09/08/21 as to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 09/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff SA Marina, LLC served on Levy Affiliated Holdings, LLC served on 09/01/21 on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff SA Marina, LLC served party Rancho Del Chino, LLC served on 09/01/21 on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialSA Marina, LLC; Turbo Court; Receipt # SC-2021-50142; Wilkes, Robert Lodge; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialSA Marina, LLC; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: filed by Plaintiff SA Marina, LLC on 8/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialSA Marina, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435 tc paid on 8/26/21 for 1st appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: filed by Plaintiff SA Marina, LLC against all defendants on 8/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATHENA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where LEVY AFFILATED HOLDINGS. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILKES ROBERT LODGE