This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/04/2022 at 20:02:22 (UTC).

ROTHSCHILD -v- MAPTELLIGENT, INC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 ROTHSCHILD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAPTELLIGENT, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Driessen, Robert and Robert Driessen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3213

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Driessen, Robert

Robert Driessen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROTHSCHILD, JOEL S.

Defendants

MAPTELLIGENT, INC

JOE COSIO

BARRON

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear Filed

* Public *

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

* Public *

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

* Public *

Challenge of Venue Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed

* Public *

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

* Public *

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

* Public *

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

* Public *

Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

* Public *

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: MAPTELLIGENT, INC; Comments: LETTER IS BETTER RETURNED: CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 01/03/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT VIA FAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Department: Department F6 - Fontana; Judge: Driessen, Robert; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Case ordered dismissed in its Entirety; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Pursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Small Claims Hearing: $5,000; Department: Department F6 - Fontana; Judge: Driessen, Robert; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Authorization to Appear Filed; Filed By: MAPTELLIGENT, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $95.00; Payment: $95.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $17.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: FO-2021-0033290

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $17.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed; Filed By: JOEL ROTHSCHILD; Comments: PERSONAL SERVICE - SERVED LISA RICHARDSON WHO IS NOT THE AGENT FOR SERVICE LISTED AS THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM :JOE COSIO BARRON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Document Received; Comments: VENUE CHALLENGE - VIA FAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Plaintff's Claim Filed; Filed By: JOEL ROTHSCHILD; Comments: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Plaintiff's Claim; Type: Action; Description: DEFENDANT HAS FAILED TO PAY SALARY AND SEVERANCE BENEFITS AS AGREED IN SIGNED EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT. ACUTAL DAMAGES ARE $14,906.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $78.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: FO-2021-0029184

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $3.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $75.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Adjustment; Charges: $-50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $50.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less