This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/01/2022 at 14:05:48 (UTC).

Rogers et al -v- Automattic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Rogers filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against Automattic, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gilbert Ochoa and Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0903

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gilbert Ochoa

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Big Bear Moving, Inc.

Redlands Moving & Storage, Inc.

Big Bear Moving, LLC

Rogers, Randall Lee

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

Automattic, Inc.

A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WORDPRESS

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wurm, John Gary

Defendant Attorney

PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2022

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $870.00; Payment: $870.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-27174

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court Filed; Filed By: Automattic, Inc.; Comments: Federal Case Number 5:22-cv-00750

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service; Filed By: Automattic, Inc.; Comments: of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Answer Filed; Filed By: Automattic, Inc.; Comments: filed by defendant Automattic Inc on complaint; filed 5/2/22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Automattic, Inc.; Comments: $435.00 check paid on 5/3/22 fpr first appearance fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Randall Rogers, Big Bear Moving, Inc., Redlands Moving & Storage, Inc., Big Bear Moving, LLC; Comments: filed by plaintiffs Big Bear Moving, Inc. et al served defendant Automattic Inc. on 03/31/22 on complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-13521

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Randall Rogers

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Randall Rogers

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Randall Rogers; Comments: $435.00 Check paid on 3/1/22 for 1st Appearance fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Filed By: Randall Rogers

[+] Read More [-] Read Less