This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 06:34:35 (UTC).

Reyes -v- Berry et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Reyes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Berry. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1115

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reyes, Norma

Defendants

Berry, Donald Edward

Bernards Bros Inc

Does 1 to 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Thomas V Perea PC

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas V Perea PC

Defendant Attorney

Christensen Hsu Sipes LLP

Attorney at Christensen Hsu Sipes LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

10/29/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

10/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

10/29/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

12/17/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

12/17/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

01/06/2022: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Service Filed

01/06/2022: Proof of Service Filed

Answer Filed

02/08/2022: Answer Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

02/08/2022: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialBernards Bros Inc; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-09241; Bernards Bros Inc; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialBernards Bros Inc; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialBerry, Donald Edward; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-09240; Berry, Donald Edward; $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialBerry, Donald Edward; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialBerry, Donald Edward; Transaction Assessment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $1020.00 check paid on 02/10/2022 for first appearance fee x2 and advance jury fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed; Comment: filed by defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed; Comment: Defendants Donald Edward Berry and Bernards Bros Inc.'s answer to plaintiff, Norma Reyes' complaint. filed on 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 12/30/202111:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialReyes, Norma; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Norma Reyes filed 121721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialBernards Bros Inc; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialBerry, Donald Edward; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialReyes, Norma; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 435.00 check paid on 121721 for initial filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Norma Reyes Filed against Defendants Donald Edward Berry and Bernards Bros Inc. on complaint filed 102921

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERNARDS BROS INC. is a litigant