This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 00:29:10 (UTC).

REBECCA SCOLLON -v- JAMES SCOLLON

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 REBECCA SCOLLON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JAMES SCOLLON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6306

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCOLLON, REBECCA

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sheasby, Matthew Edward

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address for Attorney Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $887.50; Total Payments and Credits: $887.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued; Comment: 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Family Law Petition Filed; Comment: 1ST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: STATUS OF FILING JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20201118-0114; ConversionPayment; $447.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $447.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES SCOLLON FOR RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION,FAX 201118-0114-VS LFH/ 435.00 FAX/ 12.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed re:; Comment: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS/PETITION BY JAMES SCOLLON WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/16/20 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20201002-0136; ConversionPayment; $5.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $5.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketFee Payment; Comment: FEE PAYMENT 201002-0136-CS FCP/ 5.50 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200924-0006; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA filed; Comment: DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 200924-0006-CK LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT 200924-0006-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3114

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEASBY, MATTHEW E.