This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 11:11:31 (UTC).

Ramirez -v- Colby et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Colby. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Frangie, Janet M and Janet M Frangie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2053

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Frangie, Janet M

Janet M Frangie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Debra Jeanne

Defendants

NPG Corporation

Does 1 to 100, Inclusive

NPG Asphalt

Colby, Jeffrey Alan

NPG, Inc

Nelson Paving & Grading, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chambers & Noronha

Attorney at Chambers & Noronha

Defendant Attorney

Law Offices of Garber, AV & Duncan

Attorney at Law Offices of Garber, AV & Duncan

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Trial Setting Order filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Stipulation & Order filed

* Public *

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Stipulation & Order filed; Filed By: Jeffrey Colby, NPG, Inc; Comments: to continue trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1475.00; Payment: $1475.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $20.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-38861

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $20.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-19669

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed; Filed By: NPG, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Debra Ramirez; Comments: Defendant NPG Asphalt served 5/26/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-27472

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 04/28/21 complaint filed by Debra Jeanne Ramirez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Debra Ramirez; Comments: $435.00 check paid on 05/13/21 for first appearance fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Debra Ramirez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less