This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 19:23:03 (UTC).

Quinn Rental Services, Inc. -v- Arrdu Construction LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Quinn Rental Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arrdu Construction LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4351

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quinn Rental Services, Inc

A California Corp.

Defendants

Arrdu Construction LLC

A Calif. LLC

Sandu, Alexandrina

Sandu, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A POLICAR

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A POLICAR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

03/11/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

01/26/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

01/26/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

01/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

01/26/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialQuinn Rental Services, Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-12575; Quinn Rental Services, Inc.; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialQuinn Rental Services, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 380.00 Filing Fee paid for on 01/26/21 for Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialQuinn Rental Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $380.00; Total Payments and Credits: $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARRDU Construction LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant