Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 18:13:50 (UTC).

Progressive Northern Insurance Company -v- Baylor-Vaughn et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Progressive Northern Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Baylor-Vaughn. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4100

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Northern Insurance Company

Defendants

Baylor-Vaughn, Cardearo D

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON | SCHWARTZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

06/15/2021: Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

Summons Issued and Filed

05/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

05/19/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/19/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

05/19/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketUnserved; Return Unserved: 06/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialProgressive Northern Insurance Company; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-31485; abc legal; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialProgressive Northern Insurance Company; Transaction Assessment; $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • FinancialProgressive Northern Insurance Company; Total Financial Assessment: $380.00; Total Payments and Credits: $380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $380 check paid on 05/28/21 for first appearance fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant