This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 00:43:47 (UTC).

Professional Collection Consultants -v- Saucedo

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Professional Collection Consultants filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Saucedo. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Jay H. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4470

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Jay H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Professional Collection Consultants

Defendant

Saucedo, Christopher

Assignee

Mid Valley Collections Bureau, a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

Attorney at Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

10/15/2021: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

10/15/2021: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

02/10/2022: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialProfessional Collection Consultants; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2022-09296; Silva Keshishian Galaxy Process Servers; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • FinancialProfessional Collection Consultants; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Party; Names; Professional Collection Consultants; Saucedo, Christopher; Mid Valley Collections Bureau, a California Corporation; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: Professional Collection Consultants; Awarded Against: Saucedo, Christopher; Amount; Damages: $1,944.84; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,370.06; Costs: $45.00; Total: $3359.90; Comment: CIVDS1111830 / Judgment 12/22/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialProfessional Collection Consultants; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $45.00 paid by Check on 2/10/2022 First Appearance Fee for Renewal of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comment: CIVDS1111830 / Judgment 12/22/2011 and Assignment filed 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS is a litigant

Latest cases where MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU is a litigant