This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 11:33:26 (UTC).

Professional Collection Consultants -v- Barron

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Professional Collection Consultants filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Barron. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Robinson, Jay H and Ronald J Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0131

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Robinson, Jay H

Ronald J Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Professional Collection Consultants

Defendant

Barron, Annette M

Assignees

Mid Valley Collections Bureau

Wireless Receivables Acquisition Group

a California corporation

a Texas limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Clark Garen

Attorney at Law Offices of Clark Garen

Assignee Attorney

Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

Attorney at Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

* Public *

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $85.00; Payment: $85.00; Credit: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $40.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-13738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $40.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau; Comments: $40.00/CK/ PAID ON 03/02/2022 FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued - Sacramento; Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: Law Offices of Christopher Stapleton; Comments: ACCRUED INTEREST $448.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-42573

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comments: civrs1101536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau; Comments: $45.00 ck paid on 7/20/21 for renewal fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Mid Valley Collections Bureau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action; Description: Original judgment entered 8/3/11

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Texas limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where WIRELESS RECEIVABLES ACQUISITION GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS is a litigant

Latest cases where MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU is a litigant