This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 18:09:09 (UTC).

Preciado -v- Western National Mutual Insurance Company, a Minnesota corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Preciado filed an Other lawsuit against Western National Mutual Insurance Company, a Minnesota corporation. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8557

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Preciado, Eddie

an individual

Defendants

Western National Mutual Insurance Company, a Minnesota corporation

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania Corporation

CNA Surety Corporation, an Illinois Corporation

DOES 1 through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown & Brown

Attorney at Brown & Brown

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

06/29/2021: Complaint Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

06/29/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

06/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

07/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

07/07/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

08/03/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: with prejudice filed by plaintiff eddie preciado on complaint filed 6/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialPreciado, Eddie; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-39871; Brown & Brown; $449.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialPreciado, Eddie; Transaction Assessment; $14.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialPreciado, Eddie; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • FinancialPreciado, Eddie; Total Financial Assessment: $449.77; Total Payments and Credits: $449.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $449.77 cc paid on 7/7/2021 for filing fee/fax/copies/postage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNA SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BOND NO. 29297 is a litigant

Latest cases where Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant