This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 18:08:10 (UTC).

PIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO -v- WILLIAMS et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 PIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF LIMITED LIABILITY CO filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keh, Winston. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1716

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keh, Winston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO

Defendants

WILLIAMS, NORMA URSULA

TURNER, LAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Block, Dennis Paul

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

08/20/2021: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

08/20/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

08/20/2021: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of

08/20/2021: Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

09/30/2021: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

09/30/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

10/05/2021: REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

10/05/2021: REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of

10/12/2021: Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of

Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles

10/13/2021: Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialPIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0026441; Block, Dennis Paul; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • FinancialPIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Los Angeles; Comment: MAILED IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of; Comment: COSTS OF $1,260.00 AND INTEREST OF $52.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: writ/memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: MEMO OF COSTS AND WRIT ARE RETURNED. CHECK FOR WRIT IS PAID TO SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT, LA COUNTY. PLEASE MAKE CORRECTIONS ON CHECK TO BE PAID OUT TO THE CORRECT COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: PSRJ/WRIT/MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialPIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0021769; Block, Dennis Paul; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • FinancialPIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: PIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Awarded Against; WILLIAMS, NORMA URSULA; TURNER, LAMAR; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,495.85; Costs: $45.00; Other: $2,477.15; Total: $5,018.00; Party; Names; PIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; WILLIAMS, NORMA URSULA; TURNER, LAMAR; Comment; Comment: (08/20/21 renewal of judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • FinancialPIW ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIF. LIMITED LIABILITY CO; Total Financial Assessment: $85.00; Total Payments and Credits: $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed; Comment: mailed in sase

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.