This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/27/2021 at 18:08:17 (UTC).

**PAGA** KATHERINE GONZALEZ ELIAS AND JAQUELINE SANTA CRUZ -V- VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 PAGA KATHERINE GONZALEZ ELIAS AND JAQUELINE SANTA CRUZ filed an Other lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3768

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees

Defendants

Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc

Vallarta Properties, LLC

Daniel Food Enterprises, Inc

Gonzalez Food Enterprises, Inc

Mercado Food Enterprises, Inc

a California corporation

a California limited liability company

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Capstone Law APC

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

05/28/2021: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/28/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

06/08/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Order Filed Re:

06/15/2021: Order Filed Re:

Order Filed Re:

06/15/2021: Order Filed Re:

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

06/15/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Notice Filed

07/13/2021: Notice Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Notice of related case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: INITIAL COMPLEX ORDER AND GUIDELINES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: RE INITIAL COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialKatherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33994; Madden Corporation DBA Prolegal; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialKatherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialKatherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-33992; Madden Corporation DBA Prolegal; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • FinancialKatherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialKatherine Gonzalez Elias and Jaqueline Santa Cruz, as aggrieved employees pursuant to Private Attorneys General Act ("PAGA"), on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved employees; Total Financial Assessment: $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $1435 Check paid on 6/8/2021 for First appearance and Complex fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCADO FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Daniel Food Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GONZALEZ FOOD ENTERPRISES INC DBA VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant