This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 08:30:34 (UTC).

**PAGA COMPLEX** Albarran -v- Kamran Staffing, INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 PAGA COMPLEX Albarran filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kamran Staffing, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cohn, David and David Cohn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4895

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cohn, David

David Cohn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Albarran, Oscar

on behalf of himself, the State of California,a nd others similarly aggrieved

Defendants

Kamran Staffing, INC

Partners Alliance Cold Storage, INC

a California corporation

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Crosner Legal PC

Attorney at Crosner Legal PC

Defendant Attorneys

Guerra Law

Attorney at Guerra Law

Walker Trial Lawyers

Attorney at Walker Trial Lawyers

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of

Notice

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

General Appearance Filed

* Public *

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

* Public *

Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of

Notice

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

* Public *

Order Filed Re:

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingType: Further Case Management Conference; Department: Department S26 - SBJC; Judge: Cohn, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Further Case Management Conference; Department: Department S26 - SBJC; Judge: Cohn, David; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $4305.00; Payment: $4305.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $1000.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-39488

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Balance Paid on Case; Filed By: Kamran Staffing, INC; Comments: $1000 ck paid 07/01/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $1000.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-38430

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Balance Paid on Case; Filed By: Partners Alliance Cold Storage, INC; Comments: $1000 ck paid 06/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $1000.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-36789

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $1000.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-07087

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $1000.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-07085

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Oscar Albarran; Comments: filed by plaintiff Oscar Albarran on 2.3.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: Complaint filed by pla Oscar Albarran on 12.27.21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Oscar Albarran; Comments: filed by plaintiff Oscar Albarran against defendant Kamran Staffing, et al. on 12.27.21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Oscar Albarran; Comments: $1,435.00 ck paid on 2.3.22 for 1st paper & complex fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAMRAN STAFFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant