This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 05:10:00 (UTC).

P J Empire Construction INC. -v- June A. Grothe Construction, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 P J Empire Construction INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against June A Grothe Construction, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foster, Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4289

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foster, Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

P J Empire Construction INC

a California corporation

Defendants

June A. Grothe Construction, INC

Maple Lane Group, LLC

JG Construction

Does 1-100

a California limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Atkinson Andelson Loya Rudd & Romo

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Rudd & Romo

HAFIF-STONEHOUSE LAW GROUP, APLC

Attorney at HAFIF-STONEHOUSE LAW GROUP, APLC

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

05/03/2021: Answer Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

04/30/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

04/30/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

03/24/2021: Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

03/15/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Notice of Case Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

03/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

03/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

03/01/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Complaint Filed

03/01/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, Bryan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialJune A. Grothe Construction, INC.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-25100; southern californai legal support services inc. field account (RIV); $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialJune A. Grothe Construction, INC.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check #162849 paid on 5/5/21 for 1st appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed; Comment: of Maple Lane, LLC, a California limited liability company on Complaint filed on 03/01/21 by P J Empire Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialP J Empire Construction INC.; Transaction Assessment; $25.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialP J Empire Construction INC.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialJune A. Grothe Construction, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialP J Empire Construction INC.; Total Financial Assessment: $464.04; Total Payments and Credits: $464.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $460.77 card payment paid on 3/15/21 for first appearance fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JG CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where JUNE A. GROTHE CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA J G CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant