This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 15:02:00 (UTC).

Oakenful -v- California Tax Education Council, INC,Franchise Tax Board

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Oakenful filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against California Tax Education Council, INC,Franchise Tax Board. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baxter, James R. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0435

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Baxter, James R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oakenful, Claudia

Defendants

California Tax Education Council, INC

Franchise Tax Board

Chanley, Brandon

Stanislaus, Selvi

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

07/09/2021: Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

07/09/2021: Claim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

07/12/2021: Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

07/12/2021: Small Claims Service by Certified Mail to:

Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

07/20/2021: Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

08/23/2021: Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

Notice - Free Form Text

09/17/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Notice - Free Form Text

09/17/2021: Notice - Free Form Text

Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

10/22/2021: Certificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

10/22/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Baxter, James R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court-Ordered - Before Trial; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase ordered dismissed in its Entirety; Comment: No appearance by moving party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing Reset; Judicial Officer: Baxter, James R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $8,800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: Per Order, -Hearing continued to 10/22/21. -Plaintiff to give notice of continued trial, along with service of the claim -Proof of Service must be filed 14 days prior to continued hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Action- No Appearance- Response by Judge; Comment: Granted-Continue to 10/22/21-Plaintiff to give notice. Plaintiff is informed that no proof of service has not been filed and return receipt card not returned signed. Plantiff to give notice to continue trial date along with service of the claim & have proof of service filed 14 days prior to continued hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Returned Unclaimed; Comment: Franchise Tax Board AFS: Selvi Stanislaus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialOakenful, Claudia; Turbo Court; Receipt # BS-2021-0005912; Oakenful, Claudia; $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialOakenful, Claudia; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialOakenful, Claudia; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialOakenful, Claudia; Transaction Assessment; $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: California Tax Education Council, INC AFS: Brandon Chanley Tracking # 7017 2400 0000 5721 0581

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: Franchise Tax Board AFS: Selvi Stanislaus Tracking #7017 2400 0000 5721 0574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialOakenful, Claudia; Total Financial Assessment: $105.00; Total Payments and Credits: $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$5,000 <$10,000 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANCHISE TAX BOARD is a litigant