This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 19:21:46 (UTC).

Nextgear Capital, Inc. -v- CNC Motors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Nextgear Capital, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CNC Motors, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4129

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nextgear Capital, Inc

A Deleware Corporation

Defendants

CNC Motors, Inc

James Thom, Clayton David

Thom, Amy Renee

Craig Thom Properties, LLC

Lotus of Upland, LLC

CDJT Development, LLC

Thom, Fraser Craig

Thom, Darlene Grace

California Corporation

An Individual and Trustee of the Thom Family Trust

A California Limited Liability Company

An Individual

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE

Attorney at PRENOVOST, NORMANDIN, BERGH & DAWE

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

08/18/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

07/30/2021: Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

07/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

05/26/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Summons Issued and Filed

05/26/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/18/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

05/18/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: (6) Notices/Acknowledgments of Receipt received 08/06/21: Re-submit attached to completed mandatory form POS-010 for each Defendant served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSubstituted Service; Served: 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:; Comment: Filed by Pla Nextgear, served Def F Thom, served on 7/28/21 on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 06/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: Filed by Plaintiff Nextgear Capital, Party served Darlene Grace Thom, served on 06/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialNextgear Capital, Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-30819; Nextgear Capital, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialNextgear Capital, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 05/18/21 Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialNextgear Capital, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a Deleware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LOTUS OF UPLAND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant