This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 20:38:20 (UTC).

Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC -v- Estes

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Estes. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald J Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6622

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald J Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC

a Limited Liabilty Company

Defendant

Estes, Kenneth Ryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

* Public *

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $126.00; Payment: $126.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $40.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-06794

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $40.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued - Orange; Filed By: LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP, Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: $21492.69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP, Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: COSTS $0 CREDITS $0 INTEREST $1093.27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP, Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: $40 CHECK 02-02-22 WRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $41.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37892

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37890

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $41.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action; Description: Original Judgment Entered 7/25/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: $45.00/$10941.52/$9372.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: $45 Check paid on 6/25/2021 for Renewal of Judgment and $41 Check for Certified copy of Application

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comments: CIVRS1201561

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Certified Copy Purchased. Number of Pages:; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC; Comments: 2; Application for and Renewal of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less