This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 17:08:13 (UTC).

MORA -v- LUNA et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 MORA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LUNA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Driessen, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0153

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Driessen, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORA, BENITO

Defendants

LUNA, AUDRIANNA

DE CID, LUIS ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

01/18/2022: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

01/18/2022: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

01/18/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Notice Filed

01/18/2022: Notice Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

01/18/2022: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

01/27/2022: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

01/28/2022: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialMORA, BENITO; Counter Payment; Receipt # FO-2022-0002182; JOHN E BOUZANE; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • FinancialMORA, BENITO; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialMORA, BENITO; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: OF DEATH OF TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT & DECLARATION OF HG LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.