This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 20:10:57 (UTC).

MONICA DALTON -v- DENNIS DALTON

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 MONICA DALTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DENNIS DALTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harrison, Arthur A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9829

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

Judge Details

Judge

Harrison, Arthur A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DALTON, MONICA MARIE

Respondent

DALTON, DENNIS HARVEY

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Zitney, Jonathon Andrew

Respondent Attorney

Rallo Travieso, A Law Corporation

Attorney at Rallo Travieso, A Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

**FL - Portal Minute Order

09/02/2021: **FL - Portal Minute Order

**FL - Portal Minute Order

10/29/2021: **FL - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketReporter's Transcript Filed; Comment: ORAL PROCEEDINGS 10/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Fax Filing; Receipt # SH-2022-02018; DALTON, MONICA MARIE; $3.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Transaction Assessment; $3.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketService by Mail; Served: 12/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: Filed summons on 1st amended petition/marriage/domestic partnership and filed 1st amended petition/mariiage/domestic partnership, both filed 11/02/21; blank response reved by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Fax Filing; Receipt # SH-2021-10597; DALTON, MONICA MARIE; $19.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Transaction Assessment; $19.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Fax Filing; Receipt # SH-2021-09640; DALTON, MONICA MARIE; $9.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Transaction Assessment; $9.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • FinancialDALTON, MONICA MARIE; Total Financial Assessment: $128.74; Total Payments and Credits: $128.74

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketResponse Filed to:; Comment: RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN OF MONICA MARIE DALTON BY DENNIS HARVEY DALTON FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. 200106-0779-CC LFH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200106-0779-CC REFERENCE NUMBER 1117516711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY MONICA MARIE DALTON FOR FAX, COPIES, ENV/POSTAGE 200106-0477-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.55 PAYMT 200106-0477-VS TSB/ 0.02 FAX/ 4.00 PAYMT 200106-0477-VS FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 200106-0477-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 038-0013295865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH JONATHON ZITNEY AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MONICA MARIE DALTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DENNIS HARVEY DALTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/05/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20191205-0009; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File; Comment: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPetition and Party Information Entered (Family Law); Comment: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 191205-0009-CK LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT 191205-0009-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3944

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZITNEY JONATHON ANDREW